There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Educator Preparation Reform Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve quality and accountability for educator preparation programs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/04/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/23/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
03/23/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/04/2016Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/04/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/08/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/08/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/23/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/01/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/27/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce02/04/2016 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education03/23/2016 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training03/23/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4471. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/2016)

Educator Preparation Reform Act

This bill amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to add as purposes of teacher quality partnership grants: (1) recruiting profession ready individuals, including minorities and individuals from other occupations, as teachers, principals, and other educators; and (2) meeting the staffing needs of high-need local education agencies and high-need schools through close partnerships with educator preparation programs within institutions of higher education.

An eligible partnership that receives a partnership grant shall use grant funds to carry out a program for the pre-baccalaureate or post-baccalaureate preparation of teachers, a teaching residency program (as in current law) or a principal residency program, or a combination of such programs.

An eligible partnership carrying out a principal residency program must perform specified activities for high-need schools.

The bill revises requirements for teacher residency programs and prescribes requirements for the establishment of principal residency programs.

An eligible partnership that receives a partnership grant may carry out, instead of a leadership development program, effective educator development programs for other educators besides teachers and principals.

The bill revises requirements for state reporting on the quality of teacher preparation.

As a condition for receiving funds under this Act or under title II of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965, a state must conduct an assessment to identify at-risk (as well as low-performing) teacher preparation programs.