There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PROP Act of 2016
Promoting Responsible Opioid Prescribing Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to remove consideration of certain pain-related issues from calculations under the Medicare hospital value-based purchasing program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/09/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/11/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/09/2016Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2016Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H658-659)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/09/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 02/09/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 02/09/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/09/2016
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 02/09/2016
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 02/09/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/25/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 02/25/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 02/25/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/25/2016
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/26/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/29/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/29/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/02/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 03/02/2016
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/07/2016
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 03/14/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 03/14/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/17/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/22/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/11/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/11/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/11/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 04/13/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/13/2016
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 04/13/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/14/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/18/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/18/2016
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/19/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/21/2016
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/21/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/06/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/12/2016
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/13/2016
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/16/2016
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/17/2016
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/09/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/13/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/13/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/22/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/01/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/06/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means02/09/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/11/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4499. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/09/2016)

Promoting Responsible Opioid Prescribing Act of 2016 or the PROP Act of 2016

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to exclude certain pain-related measures for purposes of calculating incentive payments under the value-based purchasing program (VBP). (VBP is a program that links hospital payments to the quality of care provided.)

Specifically, VPB measures shall not include measures based on a patient's assessment of: (1) the patient's need for pain medicine during a hospital stay; (2) how often, during the stay, the patient's pain was well controlled; or (3) how often, during the stay, hospital staff did everything they could to help manage the patient's pain.