There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Commission on the Organization of Petroleum Exporting Countries Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the United States Commission on the Organization of Petroleum Exporting Countries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/12/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/19/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/12/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/12/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/12/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/12/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/12/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/12/2016
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/11/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/11/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 04/11/2016
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/19/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/10/2016
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/10/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/23/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/26/2016
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/07/2016
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/08/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/08/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/08/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/09/2016
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/05/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/07/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/07/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/12/2016
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/12/2016
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/12/2016
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/12/2016
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/12/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 07/12/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/14/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/14/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/18/2016
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 09/07/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/07/2016
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/08/2016
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 09/20/2016
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/21/2016
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/22/2016
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/27/2016
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/27/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 09/28/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/28/2016
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/28/2016
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/15/2016
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/15/2016
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/17/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/12/2016 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power02/19/2016 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs02/12/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4559.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4559. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/12/2016)

United States Commission on the Organization of Petroleum Exporting Countries Act of 2016

This bill establishes the United States Commission on the Organization of Petroleum Exporting Countries (OPEC) to investigate and address any practices on the part of OPEC that prevent or reduce competition in the global oil market.

The Commission shall be composed of a bipartisan group of 16 experts on energy and related matters chosen by the leadership of both parties in Congress and appointed by the President. All members of the Commission must be U.S. citizens.

The bill requires the Commission to:

  • determine whether the anti-competitive behavior of OPEC is designed to disadvantage U.S. oil producers;
  • assess the impact of OPEC's policies on U.S. economic and energy security interests;
  • assess how federal agencies are working to alleviate the potential negative impacts of OPEC's behavior; and
  • produce policy recommendations for tax, trade, defense, diplomacy, and other areas where OPEC's behavior is found to cause adverse impacts.

The Commission must submit a report of its findings and recommendations to Congress and the President within 12 months. The Commission shall terminate within 90 days after submission of its report. On receipt of the Commission's report, the President will have 90 days to submit Congress a proposal to implement or respond to the recommendations.