There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reducing Barriers for Veterans Education Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to include the cost of applying to an institution of higher learning as part of the benefits provided under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/21/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
04/16/2015Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/16/2015Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
03/24/2015Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
02/06/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/21/2015Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (120)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/21/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/21/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 01/21/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/21/2015
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/21/2015
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/21/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/22/2015
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 01/22/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/22/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/22/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/22/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 01/22/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/28/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/28/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/03/2015
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/03/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/03/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/11/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/11/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/11/2015
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/11/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/11/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/11/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/12/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/13/2015
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 02/13/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/13/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 02/13/2015
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/24/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/24/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/24/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 02/24/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 02/25/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/25/2015
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/25/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/04/2015
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/04/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 03/04/2015
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/04/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/04/2015
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/17/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/17/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/17/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/17/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/17/2015
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 03/17/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/17/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/17/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/17/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 03/19/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/19/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/14/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/21/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/22/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 04/22/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/22/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/28/2015
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/13/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/21/2015
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/02/2015
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 07/08/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 07/28/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/09/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/03/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/09/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs01/21/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity02/06/2015 Referred to
03/24/2015 Hearings by
04/16/2015 Markup by
04/16/2015 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.456. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/21/2015)

Reducing Barriers for Veterans Education Act of 2015

Makes an individual who is eligible for educational assistance under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance program eligible for assistance with the fees for applying to institutions of higher education (IHEs).

Sets the amount of such assistance payable to an individual at the lesser of: (1) the total application fees charged to the individual by the IHEs, or (2) $750.