There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Robert Emmet Park Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

Robert Emmet Park Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Robert Emmet Park Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To redesignate the small triangular property located in Washington, DC, and designated by the National Park Service as reservation 302 as "Robert Emmet Park", and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/22/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5842-5843)
09/19/2016Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-750.
02/12/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/26/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/22/2016-6:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/22/2016-6:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5842-5843)
09/22/2016-6:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4564.
09/22/2016-6:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5842-5844)
09/22/2016-6:06pmHouseMr. Denham moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/19/2016HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 144.
09/19/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-750.
09/08/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/08/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/07/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/07/2016HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
02/19/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/12/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/12/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/12/2016 Referred to
09/08/2016 Markup by
09/19/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-750
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands02/19/2016 Referred to
09/07/2016 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4564.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4564. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/22/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Robert Emmet Park Act of 2016

(Sec. 3) This bill redesignates as "Robert Emmet Park" the small triangular property located at the corner of 24th Street and Massachusetts Avenue NW in Washington, DC, and designated by the National Park Service as reservation 302.

The Department of the Interior may post signs on or near the park, including one or more on:

  • information about Robert Emmet, his contribution to Irish Independence, and his respect for the United States and the American Revolution; and
  • information about the history of the statue of Robert Emmet located in the park.