There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

100 Years of Women in Congress Act

Short Titles as Introduced

100 Years of Women in Congress Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Department of Agriculture program for research and extension grants to increase participation by women and underrepresented minorities in the fields of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics to redesignate the program as the "Jeannette Rankin Women and Minorities in STEM Fields Program".


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/18/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 377 - 6, 2 Present (Roll no. 153).(text: CR H1774-1775)
02/12/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
04/19/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
04/18/2016-6:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/18/2016-6:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 377 - 6, 2 Present (Roll no. 153). (text: CR H1774-1775)
04/18/2016-6:34pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1780-1781)
04/18/2016-4:41pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/18/2016-4:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4570.
04/18/2016-4:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1774-1776)
04/18/2016-4:31pmHouseMr. Davis, Rodney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/29/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/12/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
02/12/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/12/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/23/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/23/2016
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/25/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2016
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/25/2016
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/26/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/26/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 02/26/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 02/26/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/29/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/29/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/29/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/01/2016
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/02/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/02/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/02/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/03/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/07/2016
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/07/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/07/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/07/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/07/2016
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/14/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2016
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/14/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/14/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/14/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/14/2016
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/14/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/14/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/14/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/15/2016
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/15/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/16/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/16/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/23/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/11/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/11/2016
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/12/2016
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/13/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/18/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/18/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/18/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/18/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/18/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/18/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/18/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/12/2016 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research02/29/2016 Referred to
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry04/19/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4570.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4570. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (04/18/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

100 Years of Women in Congress Act

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the Food, Agriculture, Conservation, and Trade Act of 1990 to designate as Jeannette Rankin Women and Minorities in STEM Fields Program Grants the current research and extension grants to increase participation by women and underrepresented minorities from rural areas in the fields of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM), with priority given to eligible institutions that carry out continuing programs funded by the Department of Agriculture.