There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

FAIR Act
Federal Adjustment of Income Rates Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase the rates of pay under the statutory pay systems and for prevailing rate employees by 3.9 percent, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/23/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/23/2016Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/23/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 02/23/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/23/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 02/26/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/26/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/26/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/01/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/14/2016
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/14/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/14/2016
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/14/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/17/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/17/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/17/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/12/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/12/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 04/12/2016
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/12/2016
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/25/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/25/2016
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/12/2016
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/12/2016
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/12/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/12/2016
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/12/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/16/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/16/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/16/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/16/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/23/2016
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/23/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/23/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/31/2016
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/08/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/08/2016
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/14/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/14/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/14/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/14/2016
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/14/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/14/2016
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/06/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/06/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/06/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/06/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/06/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/06/2016
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/06/2016
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/06/2016
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/28/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/16/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/23/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4585. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/23/2016)

Federal Adjustment of Income Rates Act or the FAIR Act

This bill increases the rates of basic pay for federal employees under the statutory pay systems (relating to the General Schedule, the U.S. Foreign Service, and the Veterans Health Administration) and for prevailing rate employees by 3.9% for FY2017.

The percentage adjustment for locality-based comparability payments for calendar year 2017 shall be an increase of 1.4%.