There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Veterans Affairs Purchased Health Care Streamlining and Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to enter into agreements with certain health care providers to furnish hospital care, medical services, and extended care to veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/23/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
02/25/2016Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/25/2016Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/25/2016Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
02/24/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/23/2016Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/23/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/13/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/07/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs02/23/2016 Referred to
02/25/2016 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/24/2016 Referred to
02/25/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4591. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/23/2016)

Department of Veterans Affairs Purchased Health Care Streamlining and Modernization Act

This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), in addition to furnishing hospital care, medical services, or extended care at VA facilities or under contracts or sharing agreements, to furnish such care and services to eligible veterans through the use of Veterans Care Agreements with eligible providers.

An eligible provider is:

  • a provider whose income in the year preceding the year of entering into an agreement did not exceed $11 million;
  • a provider who does not otherwise provide such care or services pursuant to a federal contract; and
  • a physician or provider of Medicaid or Medicare services, an Aging and Disability Resource Center, an area agency on aging, or a center for independent living.

The VA shall: (1) establish a certifying process for providers, (2) review agreements at least once every two years, and (3) use the quality of care standards set forth or used by the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services.

The VA may enter into an agreement using non-competitive procedures.