There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Business Broadband Deployment Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Small Business Broadband Deployment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business Broadband Deployment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that small business providers of broadband Internet access service can devote resources to broadband deployment rather than compliance with cumbersome regulatory requirements.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
03/16/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 411 - 0 (Roll no. 124).
03/10/2016Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Energy and Commerce, H. Rept. 114-444, Part II.
03/07/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-444.
02/24/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/17/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
03/16/2016-1:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/16/2016-1:24pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 411 - 0 (Roll no. 124).
03/16/2016-1:04pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1401-1402)
03/16/2016-1:03pmHouseUNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question of passage on H.R. 4596 which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
03/16/2016-12:54pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 4596 the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Walden demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage of the bill until a time to be announced.
03/16/2016-12:53pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H1401)
03/16/2016-12:53pmHouseH.Amdt.970 By unanimous consent, the Veasey amendment was withdrawn. (consideration: CR H1401)
03/16/2016-12:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Veasey amendment.
03/16/2016-12:50pmHouseH.Amdt.970 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Veasey. (consideration: CR H1400-1401; text: CR H1401)
03/16/2016-12:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4596.
03/16/2016-12:21pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4596 and H.R. 3797.
03/16/2016-12:21pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 640. (consideration: CR H1396-1402; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1396-1397)
03/14/2016-6:38pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 640 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4596 and H.R. 3797.
03/10/2016HouseSupplemental report filed by the Committee on Energy and Commerce, H. Rept. 114-444, Part II.
03/10/2016-11:33amHouseFILING AUTHORITY - Mr. Whitfield asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Energy and Commerce be authorized to file a supplemental report on the bill H.R. 4596. Agreed to without objection.
03/07/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 339.
03/07/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-444.
02/25/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/25/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/24/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/24/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/24/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/24/2016 Referred to
02/25/2016 Markup by
03/10/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-444 , H. Rept. 114-444,Part 2
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/17/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4596. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/16/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on March 7, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Small Business Broadband Deployment Act

(Sec. 2) This bill exempts for five years any small business broadband Internet access service provider with no more than 250,000 subscribers from the enhancements to the transparency rule of the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) under which any person engaged in the provision of broadband Internet access service must disclose publicly accurate information regarding the network management practices, performance, and commercial terms of its broadband Internet access services sufficient for:

  • consumers to make informed choices regarding their use; and
  • content, application, service, and device providers to develop, market, and maintain Internet offerings.

The FCC shall report to specified congressional committees, within 180 days after enactment of this Act, its recommendations (together with supporting data) on whether:

  • this exception should be made permanent, and
  • the definition of "small business" for these purposes should be modified.