There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Hate Crimes Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent a person who has been convicted of a misdemeanor hate crime, or received an enhanced sentence for a misdemeanor because of hate or bias in its commission, from obtaining a firearm.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/24/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
02/29/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/24/2016Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/24/2016Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H864)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/24/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/24/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/25/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/25/2016
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/25/2016
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/02/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/14/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/15/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/26/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/14/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/14/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/14/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/14/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/14/2016
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/14/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/14/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2016
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/14/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/14/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/14/2016
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/14/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/14/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/14/2016
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/14/2016
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/14/2016
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/14/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/14/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/14/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/14/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/14/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/14/2016
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/15/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/15/2016
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/15/2016
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/16/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/20/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/20/2016
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/22/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/24/2016
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/28/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/07/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/11/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/11/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/11/2016
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/12/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/12/2016
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/13/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/14/2016
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/18/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/20/2016
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 11/15/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/24/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/29/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4603. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/24/2016)

Hate Crimes Prevention Act

This bill amends the federal criminal code to prohibit firearm sale or transfer to and receipt or possession by an individual who has: (1) been convicted of a misdemeanor hate crime, or (2) received an enhanced hate crime misdemeanor sentence.

It defines "misdemeanor hate crime" as a misdemeanor offense that has, as an element, that the conduct was motivated by hate or bias because of the actual or perceived race, color, religion, national origin, gender, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability of any person.

An "enhanced hate crime misdemeanor sentence" is an enhanced sentence imposed for a misdemeanor that is based, in whole or in part, on conduct motivated by hate or bias because of the actual or perceived race, color, religion, national origin, gender, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability of any person.