There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Wild Game Donation Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide tax incentives for the donation of wild game meat.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/21/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/21/2015Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/21/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 01/21/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/27/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/27/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 02/10/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 02/24/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/24/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/24/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/24/2015
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/24/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/25/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 02/26/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 09/29/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/21/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.461.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.461. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/21/2015)

Wild Game Donation Act of 2015

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) increase the tax deduction for charitable contributions of qualified wild game meat by the processing fees paid with respect to such contributions, and (2) exclude from the gross income of meat processors processing fees paid by a charitable organization for the processing of donated wild game meat.

Defines "qualified wild game meat" as the meat of any animal typically used for human consumption but only if: (1) such animal is killed in the wild by the individual making the charitable contribution and is hunted or taken in accordance with all state and local laws, (2) the meat is processed for human consumption by a licensed processor, and (3) the meat is apparently wholesome as determined by regulations under the Bill Emerson Good Samaritan Food Donation Act.