There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Thoroughly Investigating Retaliation Against Whistleblowers Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Thoroughly Investigating Retaliation Against Whistleblowers Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Thoroughly Investigating Retaliation Against Whistleblowers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Office of Special Counsel, to amend title 5, United States Code, to provide modifications to authorities relating to the Office of Special Counsel, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/21/2016 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3990-3991)
04/25/2016 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-521.
02/26/2016 Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/13/2016 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/22/2016 Senate Received in the Senate.
06/21/2016-3:24pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/21/2016-3:24pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3990-3991)
06/21/2016-3:17pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4639.
06/21/2016-3:17pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3990-3991)
06/21/2016-3:16pm House Mr. Blum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/25/2016 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 401.
04/25/2016 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-521.
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/01/2016 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/01/2016 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
02/26/2016 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
02/26/2016 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/26/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/29/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/01/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/26/2016 Referred to
03/01/2016 Markup by
04/25/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-521
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/13/2016 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (8)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Administrative remedies
  • Congressional oversight
  • Employment discrimination and employee rights
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Office of Special Counsel

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4639. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/21/2016)

Thoroughly Investigating Retaliation Against Whistleblowers Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Whistleblower Protection Act of 1989 to reauthorize through FY2020 the Office of Special Counsel (OSC), an independent federal investigative and prosecutorial agency led by an official appointed by the President to protect federal employees, former employees, and applicants for employment from prohibited personnel practices.

(Sec. 3) The OSC shall have access to any record or other information of any agency under its jurisdiction. The Department of Justice (DOJ) or an inspector general may withhold access to information if the disclosure could interfere with an ongoing criminal investigation or prosecution, but only if DOJ or the agency head submits a report to the OSC describing the records withheld and the reasons for the withholding.

(Sec. 4) The bill: (1) extends from 15 to 45 days the period for the OSC to review a disclosed prohibited practice; (2) requires an agency to provide a detailed explanation of any failure to take action to address information about a prohibited practice transmitted to it by the OSC; and (3) requires an agency that reports agency action proposed as a result of its investigation of such information to submit a supplemental report within 180 days on whether such proposed action has been taken and, if not, why not.

(Sec. 5) The OSC may terminate an investigation if: (1) it involves an allegation that has been previously made by the same person, (2) the OSC does not have jurisdiction to investigate such allegation, or (3) the person should have known of the alleged prohibited personnel practice earlier than three years before the OSC received the allegation.

(Sec. 6) The bill expands the OSC's annual reporting requirements to include: (1) the cost of allegations disposed of by the OSC; (2) the number of stays or disciplinary actions that the OSC negotiates with agencies; (3) the number of corrective action petitions and disciplinary action complaints initiated before, and stays obtained from, the Merit Systems Protection Board; and (4) the number of prohibited personnel practice complaints that result in a favorable action or outcome for the complainant.

The OSC must include in its publicly disclosed list of noncriminal matters referred to agencies: (1) any comments from the complainant, provided that the availability to the public is appropriate, not prohibited by law, and consented to by the complainant; and (2) the OSC's comments or recommendations.

(Sec. 7) The OSC shall design and establish a pilot program in FY2017-FY2018 to survey individuals who have filed a complaint or disclosure with the OSC. The responses shall be used to improve customer service at various stages of the review or investigative process.

(Sec. 8) Penalties for violations of Hatch Act prohibitions against engaging in political activities may include a combination of the disciplinary actions and the civil penalty prescribed under current law.

(Sec. 9) The OSC must prescribe and publish in the Federal Register any regulations necessary for the OSC to perform functions required by amendments made by this bill.