There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Outdoor Recreation Jobs and Economic Impact Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Outdoor Recreation Jobs and Economic Impact Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Outdoor REC Act of 2016
Outdoor Recreation's Economic Contributions Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Outdoor Recreation Jobs and Economic Impact Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Commerce to conduct an assessment and analysis of the outdoor recreation economy of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
12/08/2016Became Public Law No: 114-249. (TXT | PDF)
12/08/2016Signed by President.
12/01/2016Presented to President.
11/28/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6518)
11/14/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6126)
03/02/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
12/08/2016Became Public Law No: 114-249. (TXT | PDF)
12/08/2016Signed by President.
12/01/2016HousePresented to President.
11/29/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/28/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6518)
11/16/2016SenateRead twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 667.
11/15/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
11/14/2016-3:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/14/2016-3:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6126)
11/14/2016-3:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4665.
11/14/2016-3:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6126-6127)
11/14/2016-3:10pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/04/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/02/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
03/02/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/02/2016 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade03/04/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4665. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-249 (12/08/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on November 14, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Outdoor Recreation Jobs and Economic Impact Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Commerce to enter into a joint memorandum with the Department of Agriculture and the Department of the Interior to conduct, acting through the Bureau of Economic Analysis, an assessment and analysis of the outdoor recreation economy of the United States and the effects attributable to it on the overall U.S. economy.

In conducting the assessment, Commerce: (1) may consider employment, sales, contributions to travel and tourism, and other appropriate contributing components of the outdoor recreation economy; and (2) must consult with specified federal agency heads and representatives of businesses, including small business concerns, that engage in commerce in the outdoor recreation economy.

No additional funds are authorized to carry out the requirements of this bill. Such requirements shall be carried out using amounts otherwise authorized.