There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Tule River Indian Reservation Land Trust, Health, and Economic Development Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Tule River Indian Reservation Land Trust, Health, and Economic Development Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Tule River Indian Reservation Land Trust, Health, and Economic Development Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To take certain Federal lands located in Tulare County, California, into trust for the benefit of the Tule River Indian Tribe, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/05/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4245-4246)
07/01/2016Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-649.
03/03/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
09/07/2016SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-538.
07/06/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
07/05/2016-7:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/05/2016-7:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4245-4246)
07/05/2016-7:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4685.
07/05/2016-7:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4245-4246)
07/05/2016-7:44pmHouseMr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/01/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 501.
07/01/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-649.
06/15/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
06/15/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/14/2016HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs
06/14/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/14/2016HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
03/08/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/03/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/03/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/03/2016 Referred to
06/15/2016 Markup by
07/01/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-649
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs03/08/2016 Referred to
06/14/2016 Hearings by
06/14/2016 Discharged from
Senate Indian Affairs07/06/2016 Referred to
09/07/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4685. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/05/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Tule River Indian Reservation Land Trust, Health, and Economic Development Act

(Sec. 2) This bill takes into trust 34 acres of federal land in Tulare County, California, for the benefit of the Tule River Indian Tribe. Gaming is prohibited on this land.

Persons claiming valid, existing rights to the land taken into trust may apply to the Department of the Interior to have those rights converted to a long-term right-of-way.