Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-141 (03/30/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on March 17, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2016

TITLE I--AIRPORT AND AIRWAY PROGRAMS

(Sec. 101) This bill reauthorizes for the period March 31, 2016, through July 15, 2016, the airport improvement program and specified related authorities, including:

  • the competition disclosure requirement under a development project grant for a large hub airport or a medium hub airport;
  • the eligibility for small airport grants of sponsors of airports in the Republic of the Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, and Republic of Palau;
  • the air traffic control contract program;
  • state and local government compatible land use planning and projects;
  • Department of Transportation authority to appropriate funds to acquire, establish, and improve air navigation facilities;
  • civil aviation research and development;
  • Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) operations; and
  • essential air service.

(Sec. 102) The Vision 100--Century of Aviation Reauthorization Act is amended to extend through the same period:

  • the authorization for airport development at Midway Island Airport, and
  • the authority of any final order with respect to the eligibility for essential air service compensation.

The FAA Modernization and Reform Act of 2012 is amended to extend through:

  • FY2016 the requirement for an Inspector General report on participation in FAA programs by disadvantaged small business concerns,
  • July 15, 2016, the pilot program under which operators of up to four public-use airports may receive grants for activities related to the redevelopment of airport properties, and
  • the same date the advisory committee for aviation consumer protection.

TITLE II--REVENUE PROVISIONS

(Sec. 201) The Internal Revenue Code is amended to extend through July 15, 2017, expenditure authority from the Airport and Airway Trust Fund, fuel and ticket taxes, as well as the exemption from ticket taxes for aircraft in fractional ownership aircraft programs.