Text: H.R.4721 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-141 (03/30/2016)

 
[114th Congress Public Law 141]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 321]]

                AIRPORT AND AIRWAY EXTENSION ACT OF 2016

[[Page 130 STAT. 322]]

Public Law 114-141
114th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To amend title 49, United States Code, to extend authorizations for the 
airport improvement program, to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 
   to extend the funding and expenditure authority of the Airport and 
      Airway Trust Fund, and for other purposes. <<NOTE: Mar. 30, 
                         2016 -  [H.R. 4721]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Airport and 
Airway Extension Act of 2016.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE; TABLE OF CONTENTS.

    (a) <<NOTE: 26 USC 1 note.>>  Short Title.--This Act may be cited as 
the ``Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2016''.

    (b) Table of Contents.--The table of contents for this Act is as 
follows:

Sec. 1. Short title; table of contents.

                  TITLE I--AIRPORT AND AIRWAY PROGRAMS

Sec. 101. Extension of airport improvement program.
Sec. 102. Extension of expiring authorities.
Sec. 103. Federal Aviation Administration operations.
Sec. 104. Air navigation facilities and equipment.
Sec. 105. Research, engineering, and development.
Sec. 106. Compliance with aviation funding requirement.
Sec. 107. Essential air service.

                      TITLE II--REVENUE PROVISIONS

Sec. 201. Expenditure authority from Airport and Airway Trust Fund.
Sec. 202. Extension of taxes funding Airport and Airway Trust Fund.

TITLE I-- <<NOTE: Time periods.>> AIRPORT AND AIRWAY PROGRAMS
SEC. 101. EXTENSION OF AIRPORT IMPROVEMENT PROGRAM.

    (a) Authorization of Appropriations.--
            (1) In general.--Section 48103(a) of title 49, United States 
        Code, is amended by striking ``$1,675,000,000 for the period 
        beginning on October 1, 2015, and ending on March 31, 2016'' and 
        inserting ``$2,652,083,333 for the period beginning on October 
        1, 2015, and ending on July 15, 2016.''.
            (2) Obligation of amounts.--Subject to limitations specified 
        in advance in appropriation Acts, sums made available pursuant 
        to the amendment made by paragraph (1) may be obligated at any 
        time through September 30, 2016, and shall remain available 
        until expended.
            (3) Program implementation.--For purposes of calculating 
        funding apportionments and meeting other requirements

[[Page 130 STAT. 323]]

        under sections 47114, 47115, 47116, and 47117 of title 49, 
        United States Code, for the period beginning on October 1, 2015, 
        and ending on July 15, 2016, the Administrator of the Federal 
        Aviation Administration shall--
                    (A) first calculate such funding apportionments on 
                an annualized basis as if the total amount available 
                under section 48103 of such title for fiscal year 2016 
                were $3,350,000,000; and
                    (B) then reduce by 20.83 percent--
                          (i) all funding apportionments calculated 
                      under subparagraph (A); and
                          (ii) amounts available pursuant to sections 
                      47117(b) and 47117(f)(2) of such title.

    (b) Project Grant Authority.--Section 47104(c) of title 49, United 
States Code, is amended, in the matter preceding paragraph (1), by 
striking ``March 31, 2016,'' and inserting ``July 15, 2016,''.
SEC. 102. EXTENSION OF EXPIRING AUTHORITIES.

    (a) Section 47107(r)(3) of title 49, United States Code, is amended 
by striking ``April 1, 2016'' and inserting ``July 16, 2016''.
    (b) Section 47115(j) of title 49, United States Code, is amended by 
striking ``March 31, 2016'' and inserting ``July 15, 2016''.
    (c) Section 47124(b)(3)(E) of title 49, United States Code, is 
amended by striking ``$5,175,000 for the period beginning on October 1, 
2015, and ending on March 31, 2016,'' and inserting ``$8,193,750 for the 
period beginning on October 1, 2015, and ending on July 15, 2016,''.
    (d) Section 47141(f) of title 49, United States Code, is amended by 
striking ``March 31, 2016'' and inserting ``July 15, 2016''.
    (e) Section 186(d) of the Vision 100--Century of Aviation 
Reauthorization Act (117 Stat. 2518) is amended by striking ``March 31, 
2016'' and inserting ``July 15, 2016''.
    (f) Section 409(d) of the Vision 100--Century of Aviation 
Reauthorization Act (49 U.S.C. 41731 note) is amended by striking 
``March 31, 2016'' and inserting ``July 15, 2016''.
    (g) Section 411(h) of the FAA Modernization and Reform Act of 2012 
(49 U.S.C. 42301 prec. note) is amended by striking ``March 31, 2016'' 
and inserting ``July 15, 2016''.
    (h) Section 822(k) of the FAA Modernization and Reform Act of 2012 
(49 U.S.C. 47141 note) is amended by striking ``March 31, 2016'' and 
inserting ``July 15, 2016''.
SEC. 103. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION OPERATIONS.

    Section 106(k) of title 49, United States Code, is amended--
            (1) in paragraph (1), by amending subparagraph (E) to read 
        as follows:
                    ``(E) $7,711,387,500 for the period beginning on 
                October 1, 2015, and ending on July 15, 2016.''; and
            (2) in paragraph (3) by striking ``March 31, 2016'' and 
        inserting ``July 15, 2016''.
SEC. 104. AIR NAVIGATION FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT.

    Section 48101(a)(5) of title 49, United States Code, is amended to 
read as follows:
            ``(5) $2,058,333,333 for the period beginning on October 1, 
        2015, and ending on July 15, 2016.''.

[[Page 130 STAT. 324]]

SEC. 105. RESEARCH, ENGINEERING, AND DEVELOPMENT.

    Section 48102(a)(9) of title 49, United States Code, is amended to 
read as follows:
            ``(9) $124,093,750 for the period beginning on October 1, 
        2015, and ending on July 15, 2016.''.
SEC. 106. COMPLIANCE WITH AVIATION FUNDING REQUIREMENT.

    The budget authority authorized in this Act, including the 
amendments made by this Act, shall be deemed to satisfy the requirements 
of subsections (a)(1)(B) and (a)(2) of section 48114 of title 49, United 
States Code, for the period beginning on October 1, 2015, and ending on 
July 15, 2016.
SEC. 107. ESSENTIAL AIR SERVICE.

    Section 41742(a)(2) of title 49, United States Code, is amended by 
striking ``$77,500,000 for the period beginning on October 1, 2015, and 
ending on March 31, 2016,'' and inserting ``$122,708,333 for the period 
beginning on October 1, 2015, and ending on July 15, 2016,''.

                      TITLE II--REVENUE PROVISIONS

SEC. 201. EXPENDITURE AUTHORITY FROM AIRPORT AND AIRWAY TRUST 
                        FUND.

    (a) In General.--Section 9502(d)(1) of the Internal Revenue Code of 
1986 <<NOTE: 26 USC 9502.>> is amended--
            (1) in the matter preceding subparagraph (A), by striking 
        ``April 1, 2016'' and inserting ``July 16, 2016''; and
            (2) in subparagraph (A), by striking the semicolon at the 
        end and inserting ``or the Airport and Airway Extension Act of 
        2016;''.

    (b) Conforming Amendment.--Section 9502(e)(2) of such Code is 
amended by striking ``April 1, 2016'' and inserting ``July 16, 2016''.
SEC. 202. EXTENSION OF TAXES FUNDING AIRPORT AND AIRWAY TRUST 
                        FUND.

    (a) Fuel Taxes.--Section 4081(d)(2)(B) of the Internal Revenue Code 
of 1986 is amended by striking ``March 31, 2016'' and inserting ``July 
15, 2016''.
    (b) Ticket Taxes.--
            (1) Persons.--Section 4261(k)(1)(A)(ii) of such Code is 
        amended by striking ``March 31, 2016'' and inserting ``July 15, 
        2016''.
            (2) Property.--Section 4271(d)(1)(A)(ii) of such Code is 
        amended by striking ``March 31, 2016'' and inserting ``July 15, 
        2016''.

    (c) Fractional Ownership Programs.--
            (1) Treatment as non-commercial aviation.--Section 4083(b) 
        of such Code is amended by striking ``April 1, 2016'' and 
        inserting ``July 16, 2016''.

[[Page 130 STAT. 325]]

            (2) Exemption from ticket taxes.--Section 4261(j) of such 
        Code is amended by striking ``March 31, 2016'' and inserting 
        ``July 15, 2016''.

    Approved March 30, 2016.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 4721:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 162 (2016):
            Mar. 14, considered and passed House.
            Mar. 17, considered and passed Senate, amended.
            Mar. 21, House concurred in Senate amendment.

                                  <all>