There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To authorize the Secretary of Homeland Security to work with cybersecurity consortia for training, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Homeland Security to establish a National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/16/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 3 (Roll no. 194).(text: CR H2409)
05/13/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-565.
03/15/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
05/17/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/16/2016-6:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/16/2016-6:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 3 (Roll no. 194). (text: CR H2409)
05/16/2016-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2415-2416)
05/16/2016-5:43pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/16/2016-5:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4743.
05/16/2016-5:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2409-2411)
05/16/2016-5:30pmHouseMr. Ratcliffe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/13/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 438.
05/13/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-565.
04/28/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
04/28/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/28/2016HouseSubcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies Discharged.
03/18/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/15/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/15/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/15/2016 Referred to
04/28/2016 Markup by
05/13/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-565
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies03/18/2016 Referred to
04/28/2016 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/17/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4743. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/16/2016)

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to work with a consortium, including the National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium, to support efforts to address cybersecurity risks and incidents, including threats or acts of terrorism.

Such a consortium must be composed primarily of nonprofit entities, including academic institutions, that develop, update, and deliver cybersecurity training in support of homeland security.

DHS may work with such a consortium to assist its national cybersecurity and communications integration center to:

  • provide training to state and local first responders and officials, develop curriculums, and provide technical assistance;
  • conduct cross-sector cybersecurity training and simulation exercises, including for state and local governments, critical infrastructure owners and operators, and private industry;
  • help states and communities develop cybersecurity information sharing programs; and
  • help incorporate cybersecurity risk and incident prevention and response into existing state and local emergency plans and continuity of operations plans.

In selecting a consortium, DHS must consider: (1) any prior experience conducting cybersecurity training and exercises for state and local entities, and (2) the geographic diversity of its members to cover different regions across the United States.

DHS must conduct outreach to universities and colleges regarding opportunities to support efforts to address cybersecurity risks and incidents.

DHS's authority to carry out this bill terminates five years after its enactment.