There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS SAVE Act
DHS Stop Asset and Vehicle Excess Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

DHS SAVE Act
DHS Stop Asset and Vehicle Excess Act

Short Titles as Introduced

DHS SAVE Act
DHS Stop Asset and Vehicle Excess Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Under Secretary for Management of the Department of Homeland Security to make certain improvements in managing the Department's vehicle fleet, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/11/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4592-4593)
04/14/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-494.
03/17/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/12/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/11/2016-3:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/11/2016-3:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4592-4593)
07/11/2016-3:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4785.
07/11/2016-3:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4591-4594)
07/11/2016-3:13pmHouseMr. Perry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/14/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 376.
04/14/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-494.
03/23/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/23/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/17/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/17/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security03/17/2016 Referred to
03/23/2016 Markup by
04/14/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-494
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/12/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4785. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/11/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on April 14, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

DHS Stop Asset and Vehicle Excess Act or the DHS SAVE Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to make the Under Secretary for Management of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) responsible for overseeing and managing vehicle fleets throughout DHS, including:

  • ensuring that DHS components are in compliance with federal law, executive branch guidance, and DHS policy regarding fleet management and use of vehicles from home to work;
  • developing and distributing a standardized vehicle allocation methodology and fleet management plan;
  • ensuring that components formally document fleet management decisions; and
  • approving component fleet management plans, vehicle leases, and vehicle acquisitions.

The bill lists responsibilities of component heads regarding vehicle fleets, including developing and annually submitting to the Under Secretary a vehicle allocation tool and fleet management plan.

The Under Secretary shall:

  • collect, on a quarterly basis, information regarding component vehicle fleets;
  • seek to achieve a capability to collect automated information regarding component vehicle fleets;
  • track and monitor component information, and review each component's vehicle allocation tool and fleet management plan, to ensure that component vehicle fleets are the optimal size and are cost effective;
  • provide guidance on how component heads may achieve optimal fleet size; and
  • as part of the annual budget process, review and make determinations regarding annual component requests for vehicle fleet funding.

Beginning with FY2019, the Under Secretary and component heads may not approve a vehicle lease, acquisition, or replacement request, no DHS official with vehicle fleet management responsibilities may receive annual performance compensation in pay, and no senior executive service official of DHS whose office has a vehicle fleet may receive access to a car service, if such heads or official did not comply in the prior fiscal year with vehicle allocation tool and fleet management plan requirements.

The Under Secretary may determine the feasibility of operating a vehicle motor pool to permit components to share vehicles to reduce the number of excess DHS vehicles.

(Sec. 3) The Governmental Accountability Office must submit to specified congressional committees a report on:

  • the status of efforts at achieving a capability to collect automated information regarding component vehicle fleets and any challenges that remain with respect to achieving the capability to collect, assess, and report vehicle fleet data for the purpose of determining vehicle utilization;
  • the extent to which the Under Secretary has identified and addressed any relevant security concerns, including cybersecurity risks, related to such automation; and
  • the extent to which the Under Secretary collects, assesses, and reports on vehicle fleet event data recorder data.

The Inspector General of DHS shall: (1) review implementation of vehicle allocation tool and fleet management plan requirements for FY2018 and FY2020 and provide information regarding any such review to such committees, upon request; and (2) submit to the committees, by six months after completion of the second review, a report regarding the effectiveness of such requirements with respect to cost avoidance, savings realized, and component operations.