There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ocmulgee Mounds National Historical Park Boundary Revision Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

Ocmulgee Mounds National Historical Park Boundary Revision Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Ocmulgee Mounds National Historical Park Boundary Revision Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To redesignate Ocmulgee National Monument in the State of Georgia and revise its boundary, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/22/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1518-1519)
03/02/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-442.
01/22/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
06/15/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
04/04/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/22/2016-1:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/22/2016-1:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1518-1519)
03/22/2016-1:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 482.
03/22/2016-1:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1518-1522)
03/22/2016-1:32pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/02/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 338.
03/02/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-442.
02/03/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/03/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/02/2016HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
02/02/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/16/2015HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
03/02/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/22/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/22/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/22/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/09/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 09/28/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 10/07/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/22/2015 Referred to
02/03/2016 Markup by
03/02/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-442
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/02/2015 Referred to
06/16/2015 Hearings by
02/02/2016 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/04/2016 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks06/15/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.482. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/22/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on March 2, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Ocmulgee Mounds National Historical Park Boundary Revision Act of 2016

(Sec. 3) This bill redesignates the Ocmulgee National Monument in Georgia as the Ocmulgee Mounds National Historical Park.

(Sec. 4) The boundary of the Historical Park is adjusted to include approximately 2,100 acres.

(Sec. 5) The Department of the Interior may acquire lands and interests within the boundaries of the Historical Park by donation or exchange only (and in the case of an exchange, no payment may be made by Interior to any landowner). Interior may not, however, acquire any land or interest within such boundaries by condemnation. Furthermore, no private property or non-federal public property shall be included within those boundaries without the owner's written consent.

Nothing in this Act or in the establishment or management of the Historical Park shall be construed to create buffer zones outside the Historical Park.

(Sec. 6) Interior shall administer any acquired land as part of the Historical Park.

(Sec. 7) Interior shall conduct a special resource study of the Ocmulgee River corridor between the cities of Macon, Georgia, and Hawkinsville, Georgia, to determine:

  • the national significance of the study area;
  • the suitability and feasibility of adding lands in the study area to the National Park System; and
  • the methods and means for the protection and interpretation of the study area by the National Park Service, other federal, state, local government entities, affiliated federally recognized Indian tribes, or private or nonprofit organizations.