There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Conscience Protection Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent governmental discrimination against providers of health services who decline involvement in abortion, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/22/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/25/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/22/2016Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/22/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/12/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/12/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/12/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/12/2016
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/13/2016
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/13/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/13/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/13/2016
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/13/2016
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/13/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/15/2016
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/15/2016
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 04/15/2016
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/15/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/15/2016
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/15/2016
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/15/2016
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/15/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/15/2016
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/15/2016
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/15/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 04/15/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/19/2016
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 04/19/2016
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/19/2016
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 04/21/2016
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/21/2016
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/21/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/21/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/21/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/21/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/21/2016
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 04/21/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/21/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/21/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/21/2016
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/27/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 04/27/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/27/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 04/27/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/27/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/27/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/27/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/29/2016
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/29/2016
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/11/2016
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/12/2016
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 05/12/2016
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/16/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 05/16/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/16/2016
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/16/2016
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/23/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/24/2016
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/24/2016
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/07/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/07/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/07/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 06/07/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/13/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/13/2016
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/21/2016
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/21/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 06/21/2016
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/22/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/24/2016
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 07/05/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/05/2016
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/05/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/05/2016
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/05/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/05/2016
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/05/2016
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/05/2016
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/06/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/06/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/06/2016
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/06/2016
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/06/2016
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/06/2016
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/07/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 07/08/2016
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/08/2016
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/08/2016
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/08/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/08/2016
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/08/2016
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 07/08/2016
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/11/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 07/11/2016
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 07/11/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 07/11/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/11/2016
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 07/11/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/11/2016
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/11/2016
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/11/2016
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 07/12/2016
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 07/12/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/12/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/22/2016 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/25/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4828. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/22/2016)

Conscience Protection Act of 2016

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to codify the prohibition against the federal government and state and local governments that receive federal financial assistance for health-related activities penalizing or discriminating against a health care provider based on the provider's refusal to be involved in, or provide coverage for, abortion. Health care providers include health care professionals, health care facilities, social services providers, health care professional training programs, and health insurers.

The Office for Civil Rights of the Department of Health and Human Services, in coordination with the Department of Justice (DOJ), must investigate complaints alleging discrimination based on an individual's religious belief, moral conviction, or refusal to be involved in an abortion.

DOJ or any entity adversely affected by such discrimination may obtain equitable or legal relief in a civil action. Administrative remedies do not need to be sought or exhausted prior to commencing an action or granting relief. Such an action may be brought against a governmental entity.