There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Micro Offering Safe Harbor Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Micro Offering Safe Harbor Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Securities Act of 1933 to exempt certain micro-offerings from the registration requirements of such Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/06/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-723.
03/23/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
09/06/2016Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 561.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-723.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
06/16/2016Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 25.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
06/16/2016Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
06/15/2016Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
04/14/2016Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises
03/23/2016Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/23/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 03/23/2016
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 03/23/2016
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/23/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/23/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 03/23/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 03/23/2016
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 03/23/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/23/2016 Referred to
06/16/2016 Markup by
09/06/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-723
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises04/14/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4850. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (09/06/2016)

Micro Offering Safe Harbor Act

This bill amends the Securities Act of 1933 to exempt from specified prohibitions against the sale or delivery after sale of unregistered securities, among other things, transactions involving the sale of securities by an issuer of micro-offerings that meet all of the following criteria:

  • each purchaser has a substantive pre-existing relationship with either an officer or director of the issuer, or with a shareholder holding 10% or more of the issuer's shares;
  • during the 12-month period preceding the transaction there are no more than 35 purchasers of such micro-offerings sold in reliance on this exemption; and
  • the aggregate amount of all securities sold by the issuer (including any amount sold in reliance upon the exemption) during the 12-month period preceding the transaction does not exceed $500,000.

The exemption provided under this bill is not available for a transaction involving a sale of securities if any of specified persons connected with their issuance would have triggered disqualification as a "bad actor" pursuant to regulations under the Act.

The bill also exempts such micro-offerings from state regulation of securities offerings.