There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Investment Company Act of 1940 to expand the investor limitation for qualifying venture capital funds under an exemption from the definition of an investment company.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/05/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 9 (Roll no. 349).(text: CR H4235)
07/05/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-660.
03/23/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/06/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/05/2016-7:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/05/2016-7:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 9 (Roll no. 349). (text: CR H4235)
07/05/2016-7:28pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4244)
07/05/2016-6:06pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/05/2016-5:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4854.
07/05/2016-5:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4235-4236)
07/05/2016-5:53pmHouseMr. Garrett moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/05/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 511.
07/05/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-660.
06/16/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 2.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
06/16/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
06/15/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
04/14/2016HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises
03/23/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
03/23/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/08/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services03/23/2016 Referred to
06/16/2016 Markup by
07/05/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-660
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises04/14/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4854. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/05/2016)

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2016

This bill amends the Investment Company Act of 1940 to exempt from its coverage any issuer whose outstanding securities with respect to a qualifying venture capital fund (other than short-term paper) are beneficially owned by not more than 250 persons.

The bill defines "qualifying venture capital fund" as one with no more than $10 million (annually adjusted for inflation) in invested capital.