There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

United States Semiquincentennial Commission Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

United States Semiquincentennial Commission Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Semiquincentennial Commission Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

United States Semiquincentennial Commission Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the United States Semiquincentennial Commission, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
07/22/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-196. (TXT | PDF)
07/22/2016 Signed by President.
07/14/2016 Presented to President.
07/12/2016 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5010)
07/05/2016 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4258-4260)
03/23/2016 Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/22/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-196. (TXT | PDF)
07/22/2016 Signed by President.
07/14/2016 House Presented to President.
07/13/2016 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
07/12/2016 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5010)
07/06/2016 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
07/05/2016-9:03pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/05/2016-9:03pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4258-4260)
07/05/2016-8:57pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4875.
07/05/2016-8:57pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4258-4260)
07/05/2016-8:57pm House Mr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/23/2016 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
03/23/2016 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/23/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 04/19/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 04/19/2016
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/19/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform03/23/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)

  • Commemorative events and holidays
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Historic sites and heritage areas
  • Military history
  • Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
  • U.S. history

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4875. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-196 (07/22/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on July 5, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

United States Semiquincentennial Commission Act of 2016

(Sec. 4) This bill establishes the United States Semiquincentennial Commission to plan, develop, and coordinate the commemoration of U.S. history leading up to the 250th anniversary of the founding of the United States.

(Sec. 5) The Commission shall: (1) prepare an overall program for the commemoration; (2) plan, encourage, develop, and coordinate observances and activities commemorating the historic events associated with the Semiquincentennial; (3) emphasize the planning of events in locations of historical significance to the United States; and (4) give special emphasis to the role of persons and locations with significant impact on U.S. history beginning on the date of execution of the Declaration of Independence and to the ideas associated with that history.

(Sec. 6) The Department of the Interior shall study and report to the Commission on appropriate actions that might be taken to further preserve and develop historic sites and battlefields to ensure that fitting observances and exhibits may be held at such sites during the celebration.

The Federal Council on the Arts and the Humanities, the National Endowment for the Arts, the National Endowment for the Humanities, the Library of Congress, the Smithsonian Institution, and the National Archives shall cooperate with the Commission. The Secretary of State shall coordinate the participation of foreign nations in the celebration.

Interior shall, through a competitive process, seek to enter into an arrangement with a nonprofit organization, the mission of which is consistent with the purpose of this bill, under which such nonprofit shall:

  • serve as the secretariat of the Commission;
  • house the administrative offices of the Commission;
  • assume responsibility for funds of the Commission; and
  • provide to the Commission financial and administrative services related to budgeting, accounting, financial reporting, personnel, and procurement.

(Sec. 10) The Commission shall terminate on December 31, 2027.