There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

MEGABYTE Act of 2016
Making Electronic Government Accountable By Yielding Tangible Efficiencies Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

MEGABYTE Act of 2016
Making Electronic Government Accountable By Yielding Tangible Efficiencies Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

MEGABYTE Act of 2016
Making Electronic Government Accountable By Yielding Tangible Efficiencies Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

MEGABYTE Act of 2016
Making Electronic Government Accountable By Yielding Tangible Efficiencies Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

MEGABYTE Act of 2016
Making Electronic Government Accountable By Yielding Tangible Efficiencies Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Director of the Office of Management and Budget to issue a directive on the management of software licenses, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
07/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-210. (TXT | PDF)
07/29/2016Signed by President.
07/19/2016Presented to President.
07/14/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/2016Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5126)
06/07/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 366 - 0 (Roll no. 271).(text: CR H3480)
05/23/2016Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-587.
04/12/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
07/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-210. (TXT | PDF)
07/29/2016Signed by President.
07/19/2016HousePresented to President.
07/15/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/14/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/2016SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5126)
06/08/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/07/2016-7:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/07/2016-7:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 366 - 0 (Roll no. 271). (text: CR H3480)
06/07/2016-7:01pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3492)
06/07/2016-5:18pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/07/2016-5:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4904.
06/07/2016-5:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3480-3482)
06/07/2016-5:00pmHouseMr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/23/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 457.
05/23/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-587.
04/14/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
04/14/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/12/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
04/12/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform04/12/2016 Referred to
04/14/2016 Markup by
05/23/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-587
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/08/2016 Referred to
07/14/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4904. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-210 (07/29/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded House reported version is repeated here.)

Making Electronic Government Accountable By Yielding Tangible Efficiencies Act of 2016 or the MEGABYTE Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to issue a directive to require the Chief Information Officer (CIO) of each executive agency to develop a comprehensive software licensing policy, which shall: (1) require the CIO of each agency to establish a comprehensive inventory of software licenses; (2) track and maintain such licenses; (3) analyze software usage to make cost-effective decisions; (4) provide software license management training; (5) establish goals and objectives of the agency's software license management program; and (6) consider the software license management life cycle phases to implement effective decision making and incorporate existing standards, processes, and metrics.

The CIO of each executive agency must report to the OMB, beginning in the first fiscal year after this Act's enactment and in each of the following five fiscal years, on the savings from improved software license management.