There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Grow Philanthropy Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow tax-free distributions from individual retirement plans to donor-advised funds.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/12/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/12/2016Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/12/2016
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 04/12/2016
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 04/12/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 04/12/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/12/2016
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 04/14/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/18/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/18/2016
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/21/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/21/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 04/27/2016
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/27/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/28/2016
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/11/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/11/2016
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/19/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/24/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/24/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/07/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/07/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/21/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/21/2016
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/22/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/22/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 07/05/2016
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/05/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/05/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/05/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/07/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/07/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/15/2016
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 09/21/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/21/2016
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/22/2016
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/26/2016
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/27/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/28/2016
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/28/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/28/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 11/15/2016
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 11/15/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 11/15/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/15/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 11/15/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/30/2016
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/30/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 12/01/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/12/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4907. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/12/2016)

Grow Philanthropy Act of 2016

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from the gross income of an individual who is at least 70-1/2 years of age up to $100,000 in distributions from an individual retirement plan to a donor-advised fund.

(A donor-advised fund is a fund or account that is separately identified by reference to contributions of a donor or donors. The account is owned and controlled by a sponsoring charitable organization, while the donor retains advisory privileges with respect to the distribution and investment of funds in the account.)