There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

American Manufacturing Competitiveness Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

American Manufacturing Competitiveness Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

American Manufacturing Competitiveness Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

American Manufacturing Competitiveness Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

American Manufacturing Competitiveness Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a process for the submission and consideration of petitions for temporary duty suspensions and reductions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
05/20/2016Became Public Law No: 114-159. (TXT | PDF)
05/20/2016Signed by President.
05/18/2016Presented to President.
05/10/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2673)
04/27/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 2 (Roll no. 166).(text: CR H2014-2016)
04/25/2016Committee on Rules discharged.
04/25/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-519, Part I.
04/13/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/20/2016Became Public Law No: 114-159. (TXT | PDF)
05/20/2016Signed by President.
05/18/2016HousePresented to President.
05/11/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/10/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2673)
04/28/2016SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
04/27/2016-3:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/27/2016-3:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 2 (Roll no. 166). (text: CR H2014-2016)
04/27/2016-3:10pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2035)
04/27/2016-1:47pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/27/2016-1:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4923.
04/27/2016-1:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2014-2019)
04/27/2016-1:22pmHouseMr. Brady (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/25/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 399.
04/25/2016HouseCommittee on Rules discharged.
04/25/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-519, Part I.
04/20/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/20/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/14/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/13/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/13/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/13/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/13/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/13/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/15/2016
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 04/15/2016
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 04/15/2016
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/15/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/15/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/15/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/15/2016
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/15/2016
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/15/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 04/15/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 04/20/2016
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/20/2016
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/20/2016
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/20/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 04/20/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 04/20/2016
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/20/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/20/2016
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/20/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/20/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 04/20/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/20/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/20/2016
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/20/2016
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/20/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/20/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/20/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/20/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/20/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/25/2016
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 04/25/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 04/25/2016
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/25/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/25/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/25/2016
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 04/25/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 04/25/2016
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/25/2016
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/25/2016
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/25/2016
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/25/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/25/2016
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/25/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means04/13/2016 Referred to
04/20/2016 Markup by
04/25/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-519
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade04/14/2016 Referred to
House Rules04/13/2016 Referred to
04/25/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4923. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-159 (05/20/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on April 25, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

American Manufacturing Competitiveness Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill declares the sense of Congress that it should consider a miscellaneous tariff bill.

(Sec. 3) The U.S. International Trade Commission shall:

  • conduct a process, meeting specified requirements, for the submission and consideration of petitions for duty suspensions and reductions; and
  • report to Congress on the effects of duty suspensions and reductions enacted pursuant to this Act on producers, purchasers, and consumers in the United States.

(Sec. 5) The bill prescribes requirements for publication by specified congressional committees of a list of limited tariff benefits contained in a miscellaneous tariff bill.