There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Teacher Debt Relief Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to change certain eligibility provisions for loan forgiveness for teachers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/13/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
09/19/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/13/2016Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/13/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 04/13/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 04/26/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/11/2016
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/12/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce04/13/2016 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training09/19/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4933.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4933. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/13/2016)

Teacher Debt Relief Act

This bill amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to allow an eligible teacher to use the same teaching service to qualify for both the teacher and public service loan forgiveness programs.