There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

End Executive Overreach Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that no Federal funds, fees, or resources may be used to implement certain Executive orders, to suspend rule making authority, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/15/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/17/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/15/2016Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2016Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2016Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (106)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/15/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 04/15/2016
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 04/15/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/15/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 04/15/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/18/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/18/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 04/18/2016
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/18/2016
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/18/2016
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/19/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 04/26/2016
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/27/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 05/10/2016
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/10/2016
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/11/2016
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/19/2016
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/23/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/23/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 05/23/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/24/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 05/24/2016
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/24/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/24/2016
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/24/2016
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/24/2016
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/25/2016
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/25/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/10/2016
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/10/2016
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 06/21/2016
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 06/21/2016
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/28/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform04/15/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary04/15/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law05/17/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4956.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4956. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/15/2016)

End Executive Overreach Act

This bill prohibits, until January 21, 2017, the use of federal funds, fees, or resources to implement an executive order issued on or after the enactment of this bill.

The bill prohibits any agency, until such date, from making or finalizing:

  • a major rule (a rule that is likely to result in an annual effect on the economy of $100 million or more);
  • a rule that may raise novel legal or policy issues arising out of legal mandates, the President's priorities, or the principles set forth in Executive Order 12866 (which requires that significant regulatory actions be submitted for review by the Office of Information and Regulatory Affairs of the Office of Management and Budget); or
  • a rule that may create a serious inconsistency or otherwise interfere with an action taken or planned by another agency.