There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Federal building located at 99 New York Avenue, N.E., in the District of Columbia as the "Ariel Rios Federal Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
05/20/2016Became Public Law No: 114-160. (TXT | PDF)
05/20/2016Signed by President.
05/18/2016Presented to President.
05/16/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2832)
05/10/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 180).(text: CR H2172)
05/03/2016Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-534.
04/15/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
05/20/2016Became Public Law No: 114-160. (TXT | PDF)
05/20/2016Signed by President.
05/18/2016HousePresented to President.
05/17/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2832)
05/11/2016SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
05/10/2016-6:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/10/2016-6:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 180). (text: CR H2172)
05/10/2016-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2192-2193)
05/10/2016-4:16pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/10/2016-4:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4957.
05/10/2016-4:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2172-2173)
05/10/2016-4:07pmHouseMr. Curbelo (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/03/2016HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 111.
05/03/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-534.
04/20/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
04/20/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/20/2016HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
04/18/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/15/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
04/15/2016HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E496)
04/15/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/15/2016 Referred to
04/20/2016 Markup by
05/03/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-534
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management04/18/2016 Referred to
04/20/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4957. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-160 (05/20/2016)

(Sec. 1) This bill designates the federal building located at 99 New York Avenue, N.E., in the District of Columbia as the "Ariel Rios Federal Building."