There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Firearm Due Process Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the National Instant Criminal Background Check System to make a final disposition of requests to correct its records within 60 days, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/18/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/17/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/18/2016Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 04/18/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 04/18/2016
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 04/18/2016
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/18/2016
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 04/18/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 04/18/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 04/18/2016
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 04/18/2016
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large]* 04/18/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 04/18/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 04/18/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 04/18/2016
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 04/19/2016
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/19/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/19/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/21/2016
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/26/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/26/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/26/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/27/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/27/2016
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/29/2016
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/10/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 05/10/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/10/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/13/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/13/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/21/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/21/2016
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/05/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/05/2016
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/05/2016
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/14/2016
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/06/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/06/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/06/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 09/14/2016
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/14/2016
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/20/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/20/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 09/20/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/20/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/20/2016
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4] 09/20/2016
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/20/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/20/2016
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/20/2016
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 09/27/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/27/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/28/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary04/18/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations05/17/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4980.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4980. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/18/2016)

Firearm Due Process Protection Act

This bill amends the Brady Handgun Violence Protection Act to establish a 60-day time limit for the Department of Justice to make a final disposition of a request to correct a record in the National Instant Criminal Background Check System. With respect to violations of that limit, the bill establishes a private right to action.