There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 10721 E Jefferson Ave in Detroit, Michigan, as the "Mary E. McCoy Post Office Building".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 10721 E Jefferson Ave in Detroit, Michigan, as the "Mary Eleanora McCoy Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-214. (TXT | PDF)
07/29/2016Signed by President.
07/19/2016Presented to President.
07/14/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/2016Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5192-5193)
06/21/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3991-3992)
04/21/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
07/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-214. (TXT | PDF)
07/29/2016Signed by President.
07/19/2016HousePresented to President.
07/15/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/14/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/2016SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5192-5193)
06/22/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/21/2016-3:30pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/21/2016-3:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/21/2016-3:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3991-3992)
06/21/2016-3:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5028.
06/21/2016-3:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3991-3992)
06/21/2016-3:24pmHouseMr. Blum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/17/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/17/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
04/21/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
04/21/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform04/21/2016 Referred to
05/17/2016 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/22/2016 Referred to
07/14/2016 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5028.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5028. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-214 (07/29/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on June 21, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 10721 E Jefferson Ave in Detroit, Michigan, as the "Mary E. McCoy Post Office Building."