There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Preserving Access to Modern Prosthetic Limbs Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose a moratorium on the implementation of a proposed Medicare local coverage determination on lower limb prostheses.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/25/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
05/05/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/29/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/25/2016Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2016Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2016Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/25/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/07/2016
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/22/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/25/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/05/2016 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/25/2016 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/29/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5045.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5045. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/2016)

Preserving Access to Modern Prosthetic Limbs Act of 2016

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to postpone implementation and enforcement of a local coverage determination (LCD) proposed by a Medicare Administrative Contractor (MAC) on lower limb prostheses. (An LCD is a decision by a MAC, which is a private insurer that processes Medicare claims within a specified geographic jurisdiction, as to whether to cover a service on a MAC-wide basis.) The Centers for Medicare & Medicaid shall provide guidance and oversight related to LCDs, as specified by the bill.