There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Veterans' Educational Choice Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protecting Veterans' Educational Choice Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Veterans' Educational Choice Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs and the Secretary of Labor to provide information to veterans and members of the Armed Forces about articulation agreements between institutions of higher learning, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/30/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 3 (Roll no. 591).
11/14/2016Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-813.
04/25/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
12/01/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
11/30/2016-1:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2016-1:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 3 (Roll no. 591).
11/30/2016-1:34pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6893-6894)
11/29/2016-4:52pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/29/2016-4:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5047.
11/29/2016-4:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6337-6338; text of measure as reported in House: CR H6337)
11/29/2016-4:44pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/14/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 637.
11/14/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-813.
09/21/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/21/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/13/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/25/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/25/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/25/2016 Referred to
09/21/2016 Markup by
11/14/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-813
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity05/13/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5047.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5047. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/30/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Protecting Veterans' Educational Choice Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill requires Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) counselors who provide specified educational or vocational counseling services to provide a requesting veteran or member of the Armed Forces with information about the articulation agreements (agreements governing the transferability of credits toward meeting specific degree or program requirements) of each institution of higher learning in which the individual is interested.

The VA shall: (1) provide a veteran who is certified as eligible for VA educational assistance with information on education counseling services and articulation agreements, and (2) implement this bill within 90 days after its enactment.