There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Good Samaritan Assessment Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

Good Samaritan Assessment Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Good Samaritan Assessment Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a study by the Comptroller General of the United States on Good Samaritan laws that pertain to treatment of opioid overdoses, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/10/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2179)
05/06/2016Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-540.
04/26/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/11/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/10/2016-5:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/10/2016-5:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2179)
05/10/2016-4:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5048.
05/10/2016-4:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2179)
05/10/2016-4:55pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/06/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 416.
05/06/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-540.
04/28/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/27/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/27/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/26/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
04/26/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/26/2016 Referred to
04/27/2016 Markup by
05/06/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-540
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations04/28/2016 Referred to
Senate Judiciary05/11/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5048. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/10/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Good Samaritan Assessment Act of 2016

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Government Accountability Office to submit a report about the Office of National Drug Control Policy's (ONDCP's) review of state and local Good Samaritan laws that exempt from criminal or civil liability any individual who administers an opioid overdose reversal drug or device or who contacts emergency services providers in response to an overdose. The report must: (1) address the extent to which the ONDCP has reviewed such Good Samaritan laws, including any findings related to the potential effects of such laws; (2) describe the ONDCP's efforts to encourage enactment of such laws; and (3) provide a compilation of such Good Samaritan laws in effect in states.

(Sec. 4) For purposes of the report, "opioid" means any drug, including heroin, having an addiction-forming or addiction-sustaining liability similar to morphine or being capable of conversion into a drug having such addiction-forming or addiction-sustaining liability.