There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

NSF Major Research Facility Reform Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

NSF Major Research Facility Reform Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

NSF Major Research Facility Reform Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for improved management and oversight of major multi-user research facilities funded by the National Science Foundation, to ensure transparency and accountability of construction and management costs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/14/2016 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 9 (Roll no. 301).(text: CR 6/14/2016 H3732-3733)
06/13/2016 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 114-619.
04/26/2016 Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
06/15/2016 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
06/14/2016-1:51pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/14/2016-1:51pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 9 (Roll no. 301). (text: CR 6/14/2016 H3732-3733)
06/14/2016-1:45pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3776-3777)
06/13/2016-7:23pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/13/2016-7:04pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5049.
06/13/2016-7:04pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3732-3735)
06/13/2016-7:04pm House Mr. Loudermilk moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/13/2016 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 481.
06/13/2016 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 114-619.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/27/2016 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/27/2016 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/26/2016 House Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
04/26/2016 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/26/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology04/26/2016 Referred to
04/27/2016 Markup by
06/13/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-619
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions06/15/2016 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (13)

  • Accounting and auditing
  • Building construction
  • Congressional oversight
  • Employment discrimination and employee rights
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Fraud offenses and financial crimes
  • Government information and archives
  • Government studies and investigations
  • National Science Foundation
  • Public contracts and procurement
  • Research administration and funding
  • User charges and fees

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5049. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/14/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 13, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

NSF Major Research Facility Reform Act of 2016

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the National Science Foundation (NSF) to maintain a Large Facilities Office to support its research directorates in the development, implementation, and assessment of major multi-user research facilities.

The NSF shall appoint a senior agency official to head the Office, whose responsibility shall be to oversee development, construction, and transfer to operations of major multi-user facilities across the NSF.

The bill requires:

  • an external cost proposal analysis for any major multi-user research facility;
  • the resolution of all issues identified, including any unjustified or questionable cost items; and
  • biennial incurred cost audits of any such facility.

The NSF shall not make any award which arranges for contributions to an awardee's contingency reserve.

(Contingency is the part of a budget estimate of future costs associated with possible events or conditions arising from causes whose precise outcome is indeterminable at the time of estimate, and that experience shows will likely result, in aggregate, in additional costs for the approved activity or project.)

The NSF shall update its Large Facilities Manual and any other applicable guidance for estimating, monitoring, and accounting for contingencies on major multi-user research facilities.

The updated policy shall state that the NSF: (1) may only include contingency amounts in an award meeting specified criteria; and (2) shall retain control over funds budgeted for contingency, but may disburse budgeted contingency funds incrementally to an awardee to ensure project stability and continuity.

An awardee shall: (1) furnish verifiable documentation to support proposed contingency amounts, and (2) support requests for the release of contingency funds with evidence of a bona fide need and reasonable and allowable allocations to the performance baseline.

The NSF shall work with current awardees to: (1) determine if any of their use of contingency funds represents out-of-scope changes for which prior NSF written approval was not obtained, and (2) identify appropriate financial action regarding any out-of-scope changes found.

The NSF may include management fees under an award for ordinary and legitimate business expenses, not otherwise allowable, only if the awardee furnishes a justification of need.

The NSF shall require award applicants to report:

  • income and financial information covering at least three prior years, including cash on hand and net asset information, in support of a request for management fees; and
  • any sources of nonfederal funds received in excess of $50,000 during the award period.

The NSF shall require awardees to track and report annually all expenses reimbursed or otherwise paid for with management fee funds.

The bill specifies prohibited uses for management fees.

(Sec. 4) The bill subjects the NSF to the pilot program for enhancement of contractor protection from reprisal for (whistleblower) disclosure of certain information.

The NSF shall arrange for education and training for NSF managers and staff on the pilot program and furnish information on it to all awardees and contractors and their employees.