There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

EUREKA Act
Ensuring Useful Research Expenditures is Key for Alzheimer's Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish EUREKA Prize Competitions to accelerate discovery and development of disease-modifying, preventive, or curative treatments for Alzheimer's disease and related dementia, to encourage efforts to enhance detection and diagnosis of such diseases, or to enhance the quality and efficiency of care of individuals with such diseases.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/27/2016 Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/29/2016 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/27/2016 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/27/2016 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E606)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/27/2016 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/27/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 04/27/2016
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/10/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 05/10/2016
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/11/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/12/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 05/13/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/13/2016
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/13/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/13/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/13/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/16/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/2016
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/17/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/18/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/18/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/18/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/18/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/18/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/19/2016
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/19/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/23/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/24/2016
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/24/2016
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/24/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 05/24/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/25/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/27/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/07/2016
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/09/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/13/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/20/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 07/05/2016
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/18/2016
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/06/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/06/2016
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 09/12/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/14/2016
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/16/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/27/2016 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/29/2016 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (12)

  • Advisory bodies
  • Aging
  • Department of Health and Human Services
  • Health programs administration and funding
  • Health promotion and preventive care
  • Health technology, devices, supplies
  • Medical research
  • Medical tests and diagnostic methods
  • National Institutes of Health (NIH)
  • Neurological disorders
  • Research administration and funding

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5073. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/27/2016)

Ensuring Useful Research Expenditures is Key for Alzheimer's Act or the EUREKA Act

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require the National Institutes of Health (NIH) to establish EUREKA prize competitions to achieve high-priority breakthroughs in Alzheimer's disease and dementia prevention, diagnosis, treatment, and care.

The NIH must: (1) convene an advisory council of nongovernmental experts in Alzheimer's disease and dementia to develop the EUREKA prize competitions, and (2) appoint a panel of judges to evaluate submissions. The council and panel are not subject to the Federal Advisory Committee Act.

Support for EUREKA prize competitions may be provided by private organizations and individuals.