There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

STAND for Ukraine Act
Stability and Democracy for Ukraine Act

Short Titles as Introduced

STAND for Ukraine Act
Stability and Democracy for Ukraine Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To contain, reverse, and deter Russian aggression in Ukraine, to assist Ukraine's democratic transition, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/21/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5782-5784)
04/28/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/22/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
09/21/2016-8:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2016-8:29pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5782-5784)
09/21/2016-8:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5094.
09/21/2016-8:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5782-5787)
09/21/2016-8:18pmHouseMr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/14/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/14/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/12/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/28/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/28/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/28/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/28/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/28/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/28/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/13/2016
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/13/2016
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/13/2016
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/13/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/13/2016
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/13/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 05/13/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/13/2016
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/13/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/17/2016
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/23/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/23/2016
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/25/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/25/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/26/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/03/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/15/2016
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/05/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/06/2016
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/11/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 07/21/2016
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/25/2016

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs04/28/2016 Referred to
07/14/2016 Markup by
House Financial Services04/28/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary04/28/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/28/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade05/12/2016 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations09/22/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5094. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/21/2016)

Stability and Democracy for Ukraine Act or the STAND for Ukraine Act

This bill states that it is U.S. policy to assist the government of Ukraine in restoring its sovereignty and territorial integrity in order to reverse and deter Russian aggression in Ukraine.

The bill prohibits: (1) a federal agency from taking any action or extending any assistance that recognizes Russian sovereignty over Crimea, its airspace, or its territorial waters; and (2) the Government Publishing Office from printing any document indicating Crimea as part of the Russian Federation (Russia).

U.S. sanctions provided for in Executive Order 13685 (blocking property of certain persons and prohibiting certain transactions with respect to the Crimea region of Ukraine) shall remain in effect until the President certifies to Congress that Ukraine's sovereignty over Crimea has been restored.

The Support for the Sovereignty, Integrity, Democracy, and Economic Stability of Ukraine Act of 2014 is amended to authorize the President to block and prohibit a foreign person's transactions of property or property interests that are U.S.-sited or controlled by a U.S. person if the foreign person has knowingly: (1) violated Executive Orders 13685 or Executive Orders 13360 or 13661 (blocking property of persons contributing to the situation in Ukraine), or (2) facilitated deceptive or structured transactions for, or on behalf of, any person subject to U.S. sanctions against Russia.

The President is authorized to impose similar sanctions against a foreign person: (1) who is responsible for, or complicit in, the commission of serious human rights abuses in any territory occupied or controlled by Russia; or (2) has materially assisted, or provided financial, material, or technological support for, such a person or is controlled by such a person.

The President shall: (1) use U.S. influence to seek North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) adoption of a policy that opposes the transfer of defense articles and services to Russia while Russia occupies the territory of Ukraine or of a NATO member, and (2) direct appropriate U.S. agencies to monitor and identify transfers by NATO members of defense articles and services that are contrary to U.S policy.

The Department of State shall develop and implement a strategy to respond to Russian-supported disinformation and propaganda efforts against persons in countries bordering Russia.