There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

BOTS Act
Better On-line Ticket Sales Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

BOTS Act
Better On-line Ticket Sales Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

BOTS Act
Better On-line Ticket Sales Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit, as an unfair and deceptive act or practice in commerce, the sale or use of certain software to circumvent control measures used by Internet ticket sellers to ensure equitable consumer access to tickets for any given event, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/12/2016 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/09/2016 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-733.
04/28/2016 Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
09/13/2016 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/12/2016-5:13pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2016-5:13pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5292-5293)
09/12/2016-4:54pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5104.
09/12/2016-4:54pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5292-5295)
09/12/2016-4:54pm House Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/09/2016 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 569.
09/09/2016 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-733.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/13/2016 House Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/13/2016 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2016 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/09/2016 House Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade
06/09/2016 House Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade
06/08/2016 House Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade
04/29/2016 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/28/2016 House Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/28/2016 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/28/2016 Referred to
07/13/2016 Markup by
09/09/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-733
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade04/29/2016 Referred to
06/09/2016 Markup by
06/09/2016 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/13/2016 Referred to

Related Bills (3)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (8)

  • Civil actions and liability
  • Competition and antitrust
  • Computers and information technology
  • Consumer affairs
  • Internet and video services
  • Legal fees and court costs
  • Retail and wholesale trades

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5104. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/12/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on September 9, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Better On-line Ticket Sales Act of 2016 or the BOTS Act

(Sec. 2) This bill prohibits the sale of computer software that: (1) is primarily designed to circumvent technology that limits purchases made via an online ticket selling system, (2) has only a limited commercially significant purpose other than for such circumvention, or (3) is marketed to use for such circumvention.

The bill also prohibits the use of such circumvention software in violation of a system operator's posted limits on: (1) the quantity of tickets purchased by a single user; (2) the sequence, number, or frequency of transactions; or (3) the geographic location of transactions.

In addition, the bill makes it unlawful to resell in commerce tickets that were acquired through such a prohibited use of circumvention software if the reseller participated in, had the ability to control, or should have known about the violation.

It shall not be unlawful, however, to create or use software to: (1) investigate or further the enforcement or defense of any alleged violation of this bill, or (2) identify and analyze flaws and vulnerabilities of a computerized event ticketing system if these activities are conducted to advance the state of knowledge in the field of computer system security or to assist in the development of computer security products.

Violations shall be treated as unfair and deceptive acts or practices under the Federal Trade Commission Act.

The Federal Trade Commission and state attorneys general may enforce against violations.