There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

No 2H2O from Iran Act

Short Titles as Introduced

No 2H2O from Iran Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the obligation or expenditure of funds available to any Federal department or agency for any fiscal year to purchase or issue a license for the purchase of heavy water produced in Iran.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/13/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 249 - 176 (Roll no. 441).(text: CR H4860)
04/28/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
07/14/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/13/2016-5:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/13/2016-5:32pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 249 - 176 (Roll no. 441). (text: CR H4860)
07/13/2016-5:06pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/13/2016-4:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House continued debate on H.R. 5119.
07/13/2016-4:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5119.
07/13/2016-4:16pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4992, H.R. 5119 and H.R. 5631 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
07/13/2016-4:16pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 819. (consideration: CR H4860-4866)
07/11/2016-10:03pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 819 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4992, H.R. 5119 and H.R. 5631 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
04/28/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
04/28/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 04/28/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 04/28/2016
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 05/11/2016
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/16/2016
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 05/16/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/16/2016
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/17/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/17/2016
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/17/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 05/25/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/25/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/25/2016
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/25/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/25/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/25/2016
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/25/2016
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/07/2016
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/07/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/07/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/14/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/14/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 06/14/2016
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/14/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/21/2016
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 06/21/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 06/24/2016
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 06/28/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/07/2016
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 07/11/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/11/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/11/2016
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/11/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/28/2016 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations07/14/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5119. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/13/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

No 2H2O from Iran Act

(Sec. 2) This bill prohibits funds available to any federal department or agency for any fiscal year from being obligated or expended to purchase or issue a license to purchase heavy water produced in Iran.