There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

BABIES Act
Bathrooms Accessible in Every Situation Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

BABIES Act
Bathrooms Accessible in Every Situation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

BABIES Act
Bathrooms Accessible in Every Situation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Bathrooms Accessible in Every Situation (BABIES) Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

BABIES Act
Bathrooms Accessible in Every Situation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 40, United States Code, to require restrooms in public buildings to be equipped with baby changing facilities.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 40, United States Code, to require that male and female restrooms in public buildings be equipped with baby changing facilities.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/07/2016Became Public Law No: 114-235. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2016Signed by President.
10/03/2016Presented to President.
09/29/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6255-6256)
09/21/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 34 (Roll no. 541).(text: CR 09/20/2016 H5701)
09/20/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-774.
04/29/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
10/07/2016Became Public Law No: 114-235. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2016Signed by President.
10/03/2016HousePresented to President.
09/29/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6255-6256)
09/22/2016SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/21/2016-6:52pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2016-6:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2016-6:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 34 (Roll no. 541). (text: CR 09/20/2016 H5701)
09/21/2016-6:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5767-5768)
09/20/2016-7:48pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/20/2016-7:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5147.
09/20/2016-7:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5701-5702)
09/20/2016-7:43pmHouseMr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/20/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 605.
09/20/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-774.
09/14/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/14/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/14/2016HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
05/02/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/29/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
04/29/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/29/2016 Referred to
09/14/2016 Markup by
09/20/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-774
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management05/02/2016 Referred to
09/14/2016 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5147.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5147. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-235 (10/07/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it passed the House on September 21, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Bathrooms Accessible in Every Situation or BABIES Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires restrooms in a public building to be equipped with baby changing facilities that the General Services Administration (GSA) determines are physically safe, sanitary, and appropriate. "Public building" means a public building controlled by the GSA's Public Building Service.

Such requirement shall be subject to any reasonable accommodations that may be made for individuals in accordance with the Americans with Disabilities Act.

Such requirement shall be inapplicable:

  • to a restroom in a public building that is not available or accessible for public use,
  • to a restroom that contains clear and conspicuous signage indicating where a restroom with a baby changing table is located on the same floor of such building,
  • if new construction would be required to install a baby changing facility in the building and the cost of such construction is unfeasible, or
  • to a building not subject to an alteration for which any appropriations must be approved by the Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works and the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.