There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 40, United States Code, to include as part of the buildings and grounds of the National Gallery of Art any buildings and other areas within the boundaries of any real estate or other property interests acquired by the National Gallery of Art.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/29/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text of measure as passed: CR H6353)
06/16/2016Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 114-626.
04/29/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
11/30/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
11/29/2016-7:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/29/2016-7:07pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text of measure as passed: CR H6353)
11/29/2016-7:07pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6353)
11/29/2016-7:07pmHouseMr. Harper asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
06/16/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 485.
06/16/2016HouseReported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 114-626.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
05/17/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
05/17/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
04/29/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
04/29/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration04/29/2016 Referred to
05/17/2016 Markup by
06/16/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-626

No related bill information was received for H.R.5160.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5160. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/29/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This bill includes as part of the National Gallery of Art all buildings, service roads, walks, and other areas within the exterior boundaries of any real estate or interest in land that the Gallery acquires and that its director determines to be necessary for the adequate protection of individuals or property in the Gallery and suitable for administration as a part of it.