There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Food and Fuel Consumer Protection Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To alleviate the ethanol blend wall under the renewable fuel program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/10/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/13/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/10/2016Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (118)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/10/2016
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/10/2016
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 05/10/2016
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 05/10/2016
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/10/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/24/2016
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/24/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/24/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/24/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/24/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/24/2016
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/24/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/24/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/24/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/24/2016
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/24/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/24/2016
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/24/2016
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/24/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/24/2016
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 05/26/2016
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/26/2016
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/26/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/26/2016
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/07/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/07/2016
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/07/2016
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/07/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/07/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 06/07/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/07/2016
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/08/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/08/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 06/09/2016
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 06/09/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/09/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/09/2016
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 06/09/2016
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/09/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/15/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/15/2016
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 06/15/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/15/2016
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/15/2016
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/15/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/16/2016
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/16/2016
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/16/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/21/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/21/2016
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/21/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 06/21/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/21/2016
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/21/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/21/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/22/2016
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/22/2016
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 06/22/2016
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/22/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/22/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/05/2016
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/05/2016
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/05/2016
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 07/05/2016
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/06/2016
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/06/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/06/2016
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/06/2016
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 07/07/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 07/07/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/07/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/07/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 07/11/2016
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/12/2016
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/12/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 07/12/2016
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 07/12/2016
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/12/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/12/2016
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/13/2016
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 07/13/2016
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 07/13/2016
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/13/2016
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/13/2016
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/13/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/14/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 07/14/2016
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/14/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/14/2016
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/14/2016
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/14/2016
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/14/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/14/2016
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/14/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/14/2016
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/14/2016
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/14/2016
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/14/2016
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/14/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 07/14/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/14/2016
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/18/2016
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/18/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 09/06/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/06/2016
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/06/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 09/06/2016
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 09/06/2016
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/06/2016
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/06/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/06/2016
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/09/2016
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/21/2016
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/26/2016
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/26/2016
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/26/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 09/28/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/29/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce05/10/2016 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power05/13/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5180.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5180. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/10/2016)

Food and Fuel Consumer Protection Act of 2016

This bill amends the Clean Air Act by revising the renewable fuel program, which requires transportation fuel to contain a minimum volume of renewable fuel. The Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) must cap the total volume of ethanol blended into the transportation fuel supply at 9.7% of projected gasoline demand as determined by the Energy Information Administration.