There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to eliminate the five month waiting period for disability insurance benefits for individuals with amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS).


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/10/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/20/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/10/2016Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/10/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/11/2016
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/11/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/11/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/11/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 05/16/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/16/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/16/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/16/2016
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/17/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/17/2016
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/17/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/24/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/24/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/24/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/24/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/24/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/07/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/07/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/07/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 06/07/2016
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/10/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/10/2016
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/10/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/10/2016
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/10/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/10/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/10/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/10/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/22/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/22/2016
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/22/2016
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/07/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/07/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/07/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/14/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/14/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/14/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/14/2016
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/14/2016
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/08/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/08/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/08/2016
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/08/2016
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 09/13/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/13/2016
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 09/13/2016
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/14/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 11/14/2016
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 11/14/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/07/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/07/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/08/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/10/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security05/20/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5183. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/10/2016)

ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2016

This bill amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act to eliminate the five-month waiting period for disability insurance benefits for individuals with amyotrophic lateral sclerosis, and require their payment starting the first month during all of which the individual is under a disability and in which the individual becomes entitled to the benefits.