There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Opioid Abuse Crisis Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Improving Safe Care for the Prevention of Infant Abuse and Neglect Act
  • Jason Simcakoski PROMISE Act
  • OPEN Act
  • Opioid Program Evaluation Act
  • Promoting Responsible Opioid Management and Incorporating Scientific Expertise Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To address the opioid abuse crisis.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/11/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date
06/07/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/26/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/18/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/18/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/17/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/13/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/11/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/11/2016 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/13/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary05/11/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations05/18/2016 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs05/11/2016 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health05/26/2016 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce05/11/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/11/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/17/2016 Referred to
House Armed Services05/11/2016 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/07/2016 Referred to
House Natural Resources05/11/2016 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs05/18/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5189. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/11/2016)

Opioid Abuse Crisis Act of 2016

This bill appropriates funding for activities in this bill.

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to provide support for activities related to opioid abuse, including treatment services. (Opioids are drugs with effects similar to opium, such as heroin and certain pain medications.)

This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act, including to permit a pharmacist to partially fill a prescription for certain drugs.

This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require the Food and Drug Administration to refer new drug applications for opioids without abuse deterrent properties to an advisory committee.

This bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to permit the Department of Justice (DOJ) to support opioid abuse services and programs for veterans.

Opioid Program Evaluation Act or the OPEN Act

DOJ and HHS must have a nonfederal entity evaluate the grants established by this bill.

Promoting Responsible Opioid Management and Incorporating Scientific Expertise Act or the Jason Simcakoski PROMISE Act

The Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) and the Department of Defense (DOD) must update the VA/DOD Clinical Practice Guideline for Management of Opioid Therapy for Chronic Pain.

The VA must carry out activities related to opioid abuse, including expanding the opioid safety initiative to include all VA medical facilities.

Improving Safe Care for the Prevention of Infant Abuse and Neglect Act

The national clearinghouse for child abuse information must provide information on plans of safe care for infants born affected by substance abuse.

This bill amends the Social Security Act, including to permit prescription drug plan sponsors to establish programs for beneficiaries at-risk for prescription drug abuse.