There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

North Korea State Sponsor of Terrorism Designation Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a report on the designation of the Democratic People's Republic of Korea as a state sponsor of terrorism, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/12/2016 Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/16/2016 Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/16/2016 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/12/2016 Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2016 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 05/12/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 05/25/2016
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 06/07/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/14/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/14/2016
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/28/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/12/2016 Referred to
06/16/2016 Markup by

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.5208.

Subjects (17)

  • Arms control and nonproliferation
  • Asia
  • Aviation and airports
  • Computer security and identity theft
  • Congressional oversight
  • Human rights
  • Israel
  • Middle East
  • Military assistance, sales, and agreements
  • North Korea
  • Nuclear power
  • Nuclear weapons
  • South Korea
  • Syria
  • Television and film
  • Terrorism

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5208. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/12/2016)

North Korea State Sponsor of Terrorism Designation Act of 2016

This bill expresses the sense of Congress that North Korea meets the criteria for, and should be designated as, a state sponsor of terrorism.

The President shall submit to Congress a report that finds, with respect to each of 22 acts specified by this bill, whether: (1) North Korea or any of its agents or instrumentalities committed, conspired to commit, attempted, or abetted such act; and (2) such act constitutes support for international terrorism.

If the President finds that North Korea or its agents or instrumentalities committed any of such acts, the Department of State shall submit to Congress: (1) a determination that North Korea is a state sponsor of terrorism, or (2) a detailed justification as to why the conduct does not meet the legal criteria for such a determination.