There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the conveyance of certain property to the Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation located in Bethel, Alaska.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/22/2015Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
07/22/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-217, Part I.
01/22/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date All Actions
07/22/2015Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 163.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2015Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-217, Part I.
06/11/2015Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/11/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/11/2015Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
06/10/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/14/2015Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs
03/02/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/23/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/22/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/22/2015 Referred to
06/11/2015 Markup by
07/22/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-217
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs03/02/2015 Referred to
04/14/2015 Hearings by
06/11/2015 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce01/22/2015 Referred to
07/22/2015 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy01/23/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.521. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (07/22/2015)

(Sec. 1) Directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to convey to the Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation in Bethel, Alaska, all U.S. interest in specified property for use in connection with health and social services programs.

Declares that such conveyance shall not: (1) require any consideration from or impose any obligation, term, or condition on the Corporation; or (2) allow for any U.S. reversionary interest in the property.

(Sec. 3) Shields the Corporation from liability for any soil, surface water, groundwater, or other contamination resulting from the disposal, release, or presence of environmental contamination on any of the property on or before it is conveyed to the Corporation.

Accords to HHS any easement or access to the conveyed property as may be necessary to satisfy any retained obligations and liability. Requires HHS to comply with Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 requirements in carrying out such conveyance.