There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Criminal Alien Deportation Enforcement Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To withhold Federal financial assistance from each country that denies or unreasonably delays the acceptance of nationals of such country who have been ordered removed from the United States and to prohibit the issuance of visas to nationals of such country.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/13/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
05/18/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/13/2016Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2016Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2016Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/13/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/13/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/16/2016
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 05/16/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/19/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/19/2016
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/19/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/19/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 05/19/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 05/19/2016
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/19/2016
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/19/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/19/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/19/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/19/2016
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/19/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/19/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 05/23/2016
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/25/2016
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/25/2016
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/26/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/07/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/07/2016
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/07/2016
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/08/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/08/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 06/09/2016
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/14/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/20/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/20/2016
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/22/2016
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/26/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 09/27/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 09/27/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/13/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary05/13/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security05/18/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5224.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5224. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/13/2016)

Criminal Alien Deportation Enforcement Act of 2016

This bill amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to prohibit financial assistance to a foreign country that refuses or unreasonably delays the acceptance of an alien who: (1) is a citizen, subject, national, or resident of such country; and (2) has received a final order of removal from the United States.

A country shall be deemed to have refused or unreasonably delayed acceptance of an alien if it does not accept such alien within 90 days of receiving an authorized repatriation request.

The Department of Homeland Security shall submit a report to Congress every three months that: (1) lists the countries that refuse or unreasonably delay repatriation; and (2) includes the total number of aliens who were refused repatriation, organized by country, detention status, and criminal status.

A listed country shall be subject to U.S. entry and financial assistance prohibitions unless it issues appropriate travel documents: (1) within 100 days after such report's submission for aliens convicted of a crime committed in the United States, and (2) within 200 days after such report's submission for all other aliens.

A victim (or an immediate family member thereof) of a crime committed by any alien who has been issued a final order of removal shall have standing in federal district court to enforce entry and financial prohibitions.

The Immigration and Nationality Act is amended to: (1) discontinue granting visas to a subject, national, or resident of a listed country unless the country has issued the appropriate travel documents pursuant to this bill; and (2) grant standing to enforce such provision in federal district court to a victim (or an immediate family member thereof) of a crime committed by any alien who has been issued a final order of removal.