There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Library of Congress Modernization Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Library of Congress Modernization Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the National Library Service for the Blind and Physically Handicapped to provide playback equipment in all forms, to establish a National Collection Stewardship Fund for the processing and storage of collection materials of the Library of Congress, and to provide for the continuation of service of returning members of Joint Committee on the Library at beginning of a Congress.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/28/2016Committee on Transportation discharged.
07/25/2016Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 114-706, Part I.
05/13/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
09/28/2016Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 624.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/2016Committee on Transportation discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/25/2016House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 30, 2016.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/25/2016Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 114-706, Part I.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
05/16/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/13/2016Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2016Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2016Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/13/2016
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/13/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration05/13/2016 Referred to
05/17/2016 Markup by
07/25/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-706
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/13/2016 Referred to
09/28/2016 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management05/16/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5227. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment, Part I (07/25/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Library of Congress Modernization Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Library of Congress to purchase, maintain, or replace reproducers for books published either in raised characters, on sound-reproduction recordings, or in any other form (currently limited to reproducers of sound-reproduction recordings) for the use of the blind and for other physically disabled U.S. residents.

(Sec. 3) The bill establishes the Library of Congress National Collection Stewardship Fund, whose amounts may be used for:

  • preparing collection materials for long-term storage; and
  • transferring amounts to the Architect of the Capitol for designing, constructing, altering, upgrading, and equipping collections preservation and storage facilities for the Library of Congress, or for acquiring real property by lease for the preservation and storage of Library of Congress collections.

The Library of Congress shall report a plan for expenditures from the fund in its first five fiscal years of operation.

(Sec. 4) The bill requires continued service on the Joint Committee on the Library in a new Congress, until new committee members are appointed, of Members of Congress who served on such Committee in the previous Congress.

The bill also sets forth requirements for determining who shall serve as Chairman of the Joint Committee on the Library before its first organizational meeting in a new Congress.