There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Clarifying Congressional Intent in Providing for DC Home Rule Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the Local Budget Autonomy Amendment Act of 2012, to amend the District of Columbia Home Rule Act to clarify the respective roles of the District government and Congress in the local budget process of the District government, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/25/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 240 - 179 (Roll no. 248).(consideration: CR H3208)
05/23/2016Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-586.
05/13/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
05/26/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/25/2016-5:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/25/2016-5:18pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 240 - 179 (Roll no. 248). (consideration: CR H3208)
05/25/2016-5:11pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 179 - 239 (Roll no. 247). (consideration: CR H3216)
05/25/2016-4:50pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H3216)
05/25/2016-4:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Connolly motion to recommit with instructions, pending reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report the same back to the House forthwith with an amendment to allow the District of Columbia government to use local funds to prevent and treat the Zika virus. Subsequently, the reservation of a point of order was withdrawn.
05/25/2016-4:39pmHouseMr. Connolly moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Oversight and Government. (consideration: CR H3215; text: CR H3215)
05/25/2016-3:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5233.
05/25/2016-3:46pmHouseThe resolution provides for consideration of S. 2012 and H.R. 5233.
05/25/2016-3:46pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 744. (consideration: CR H3208-3217)
05/25/2016-1:43pmHouseRule H. Res. 744 passed House.
05/24/2016-5:26pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 744 Reported to House. The resolution provides for consideration of S. 2012 and H.R. 5233.
05/23/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 456.
05/23/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-586.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/17/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/17/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/13/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
05/13/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/18/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform05/13/2016 Referred to
05/17/2016 Markup by
05/23/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-586
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/26/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5233. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/25/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Clarifying Congressional Intent in Providing for DC Home Rule Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill repeals the Local Budget Autonomy Amendment Act of 2012 (D.C. Law 19-321) and restores previous law as though the Act had never been enacted.

(Sec. 3) The District of Columbia Home Rule Act is amended to declare that nothing in it shall be construed as creating a continuing appropriation of the General Fund of the District.

All funds provided for the District of Columbia shall be appropriated on an annual fiscal year basis through the federal appropriations process.

The District of Columbia Code is amended to declare that nothing in it shall be construed as authorizing the District of Columbia to make any change in law, regulation, or basic procedure and practice relating to the respective roles of Congress, the President, the Office of Management and Budget, and the Government Accountability Office in the preparation, review, submission, examination, authorization, and appropriation of the total budget of the District of Columbia government.