There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Workplace Advancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to strengthen equal pay requirements.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/13/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/19/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/13/2016Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/19/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 07/25/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 09/27/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/13/2016 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections09/19/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5237. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/13/2016)

Workplace Advancement Act

This bill amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to prohibit discharging or retaliating against any employee because such employee has inquired about, discussed, or disclosed comparative compensation information for the purpose of determining whether the employer is compensating an employee in a manner that provides equal pay for equal work.

The prohibition does not apply to instances in which an employee who has access to the wage information of other employees as a part of the employee's job functions discloses such wages to an individual who has no access to them, except in response to a charge or complaint or in furtherance of an investigation, proceeding, hearing, or action with respect to prohibited sex discrimination, including an investigation conducted by the employer.